Reports for adaco Consulting AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout adaco Consulting AG
- adaco Consulting AG is active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Nuolen.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 24.07.2020. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company adaco Consulting AG is the following: CHE-100.556.769.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.11.1986
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wangen (SZ)
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.004.060-1
UID/VAT
CHE-100.556.769
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungs- und Dienstleistungen im Organisations-, Management und Informatikbereich sowie die Produktion von Software und deren Vertrieb. Die Gesellschaft kann Immaterialgüterrechte und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ACC Treuhand AG | Freienbach | 15.04.2011 | 23.07.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- adaco Consulting Ltd.
- adaco Consulting SA
- Adaco Consulting AG
- Adaco Engineering AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: adaco Consulting AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004944528, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
adaco Consulting AG, in Wangen (SZ), CHE-100.556.769, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2949987). Gemäss Erklärung vom 17.07.2020 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
ACC Treuhand AG (CHE-113.280.832), in Freienbach, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2949987, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
adaco Consulting AG, in Wangen SZ, CHE-100.556.769, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 18.02.2016, Publ. 2675033).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ACC Treuhand AG (CHE-113.280.832), in Freienbach, Revisionsstelle [bisher: ACC Treuhand GmbH (CHE-113.280.832), in Pfäffikon].
Publication number: 2675033, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Adaco Consulting AG, in Lachen, CHE-100.556.769, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 04.04.2014, Publ. 1436519).
Statutenänderung:
12.02.2016.
Firma neu:
adaco Consulting AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(adaco Consulting SA) (adaco Consulting Ltd.).
Sitz neu:
Wangen SZ.
Domizil neu:
Seestrasse 48c, 8855 Nuolen.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungs- und Dienstleistungen im Organisations-, Management und Informatikbereich sowie die Produktion von Software und deren Vertrieb. Die Gesellschaft kann Immaterialgüterrechte und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. [Weitere Statutenänderungen nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ryser, Patrik Yves, von Walterswil BE, in Wangen SZ, Präsident und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Lachen SZ];
Ryser, Annabelle, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Wangen SZ, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.