Dominik Sascha Joos
domiciled in Rheinfelden, from Germany Active mandates: Numfum GmbH, Cudera AG and more Connected persons: Carl Adrian Woffenden, Fabian Frey, Reto Kaiser and more You can stay up to date through "Dominik Sascha Joos", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dominik Sascha Joos"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dominik Sascha Joos", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dominik Sascha Joos"
|
Places where people with the name Dominik Sascha Joos live
Sectors in which people with the name Dominik Sascha Joos work
IT services
Services for banks and credit institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of investment companies
IT services
Services for banks and credit institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of investment companies
Private persons with the name Dominik Sascha Joos
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Dominik Sascha Joos
Publication number: HR02-1005949994, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 685 vom 24.01.2024 Numfum GmbH, in Basel, CHE-280.449.520, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2024, Publ. 1005946437).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Joos, Dominik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rheinfelden, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: in Rheinfelden (DE)].
Publication number: HR02-1005946437, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Numfum GmbH, in Basel, CHE-280.449.520, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 12.07.2022, Publ. 1005518720).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eich, Christian, von Basel, in Biel-Benken, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Joos, Dominik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rheinfelden (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005470949, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Cudera AG, in Basel, CHE-185.124.906, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 18 vom 27.01.2021, Publ. 1005084789).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oesch, Christian, von Oberlangenegg, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Frey, Fabian, von Basel, in Pfäffikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Joos, Dominik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rheinfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kaiser, Reto, von Vordemwald, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.