Reports for Helvetica Capital AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Helvetica Capital AG
- Helvetica Capital AG is active in the industry «Services for banks and credit institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Zürich.
- Helvetica Capital AG has 11 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 31.05.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-383.300.010.
- There are 8 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Arab Bank (Switzerland) Ltd., Helvetica Capital Invest AG, Industrial and Commercial Bank of China Limited, Peking, Zweigniederlassung Zürich.
Management (11)
newest board members
Silvio Domenico Tarchini,
Anton Neuhaus,
François Caspar Robert Albers-Schönberg,
Andreas Georg Schmid,
Dr. Wilhelm Kurt Leimer
newest authorized signatories
Silvio Domenico Tarchini,
Philipp Bucher,
Philipp Marc Berner,
Anton Neuhaus,
Nadja Laura Steiner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.042.318-4
UID/VAT
CHE-383.300.010
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung und Erbringung von anderen Finanzdienstleistungen für Investoren und Unternehmen in der Schweiz. Finanzielle Beteiligung an Unternehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 17.08.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Helvetica Capital AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005756461, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Helvetica Capital AG, in Zürich, CHE-383.300.010, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2022, Publ. 1005539783).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hauswirth, Simon Claude, von Gsteig, in Oberwil-Lieli, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Nadja Laura, von Lotzwil, in Rüschlikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: HR02-1005539783, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Helvetica Capital AG, in Zürich, CHE-383.300.010, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 06.05.2021, Publ. 1005170863).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leonhardt, Harald Enno, von Zumikon, in Stäfa, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Thomas, Andrew, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Binningen, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Johannes, von Ehrendingen, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Altendorf];
Hauswirth, Simon Claude, von Gsteig, in Oberwil-Lieli, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005170863, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Helvetica Capital AG, in Zürich, CHE-383.300.010, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 24.03.2020, Publ. 1004858688).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tarchini, Silvio, von Balerna, in Lugano, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Berner, Philipp Marc, von Schafisheim, in Kilchberg (ZH), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bucher, Philipp, von Knutwil, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.